This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 10:41:57 (UTC).

SILVER OAK CELLARS, INC. VS THE JET GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/13/2017 SILVER OAK CELLARS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE JET GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2597

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILVER OAK CELLARS INC.

Defendant

THE JET GROUP LLC DBA BESO HOLLYWOOD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 05/17/2017

5/17/2017: Minute Order of 05/17/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/13/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

05/17/2017

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2017

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2017

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2017; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2017

DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2017

DocketInvoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: ST-2017-0011654 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2017

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2017

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Silver Oak Cellars, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: The Jet Group, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2017

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana at Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 90

[+] Read More [-] Read Less