This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 06:31:11 (UTC).

SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. VS VICTORIA SALGADO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICTORIA SALGADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2101

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC.

Defendants

VILLALOBOS RICARDO

SALGADO VICTORIA

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/20/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/20/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

8/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/20/2021

8/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/20/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

8/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/11/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 06/11/2021

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 06/11/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))]

6/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

6/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Requires Approval

3/2/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) Requires Approval

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/4/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/8/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

2/1/2021: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration - Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer Small Claims]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer Small Claims]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2021 ; Status Date changed from 12/31/2020 to 08/25/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 08/25/2021 ; Status Date changed from 08/25/2021 to 08/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Filed By: VICTORIA SALGADO (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA SALGADO (Defendant); RICARDO VILLALOBOS (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/20/2021 01:30 PM at Department U

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473)) of 08/20/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment (CCP 473) scheduled for 08/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 12/31/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RICARDO VILLALOBOS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA SALGADO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/16/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol], Standing Order 9/4/20; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: VICTORIA SALGADO (Defendant); RICARDO VILLALOBOS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILICON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC. is a litigant