This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 20:19:38 (UTC).

SIERRA VIEW CARE HOLDINGS, LLC VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 SIERRA VIEW CARE HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4473

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIERRA VIEW CARE HOLDINGS LLC DBA SIERRA VIEW CARE CENTER

Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

SUSAN FANELLI MD MPH DIRECTOR OF THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Not Classified By Court

SMITH M.D. M.P.H. DIRECTOR OF CDPH KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAHANA MATTHEW I.

Respondent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

SCHNITZER GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And Proposed Order

2/14/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation And Proposed Order

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

1/27/2020: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

12/17/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

General Denial - General Denial

11/25/2019: General Denial - General Denial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/16/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/16/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearing04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation And Proposed Order; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Susan Fanelli, Md, Mph, Director Of The California Department Of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation And Proposed Order: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Karen Smith, M.D., M.P.H., Director of CDPH (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Karen Smith, M.D., M.P.H., Director of CDPH (Non-Party): Last Name changed from Smith to Smith, M.D., M.P.H., Director of CDPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: Susan Fanelli, Md, Mph, Director Of The California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Service Date: 10/30/2019; Service Cost: 34.58; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Service Date: 10/30/2019; Service Cost: 107.97; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Susan Fanelli, Md, Mph, Director Of The California Department Of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Susan Fanelli, Md, Mph, Director Of The California Department Of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC (Petitioner); As to: California Department Of Public Health (Respondent); Susan Fanelli, Md, Mph, Director Of The California Department Of Public Health (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP04473    Hearing Date: February 19, 2020    Dept: 26

Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC v. California Department of Public Health, et al.

HEARING ON PETITION RE CITATION FOR VIOLATION OF THE LONG-TERM CARE, HEALTH, SAFETY AND SECURITY ACT OF 1973

(Cal. Health & Safety Code § 1428)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Petition of Plaintiff Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC dba Sierra View Care Center

to Dismiss Citation is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The matter is set for trial on April 16, 2021 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

ANALYSIS:

On October 16, 2019, Plaintiff Sierra View Care Holdings, LLC dba Sierra View Care Center (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action challenging the issuance of a citation for violation of the Long Term Care, Health, Safety, and Security Action of 1973 against Defendant State of California Department of Health (“Defendant”). The initial pleading is a Complaint to dismiss the citation and proposed assessment of civil penalties. Defendant filed its Answer on November 25, 2019. The case was incorrectly designated “Other Civil Petition” and set for hearing with respect to the non-existent petition on February 19, 2020.

On February 5, 2020, the parties filed a stipulation to vacate the hearing on Petition and set the matter for trial. Accordingly, the court changes the designation of this case from “Other Civil Petition” to “Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex)” and takes the hearing on the non-existent petition off calendar. The matter is set for trial on April 16, 2021 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

Plaintiff to give notice.