This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2019 at 15:40:21 (UTC).

SHULMAN, STEVEN VS JONES, JERRI L.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2012 SHULMAN, STEVEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JONES, JERRI L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0561

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHULMAN STEVEN

Defendant

JONES JERRI L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOMINIC J TRUTANICH

TRUTANICH DOMINIC J

Defendant Attorney

JONES, JERRI L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT NOT ATTACHED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/12/12, 08:30 AM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.