This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2019 at 15:31:50 (UTC).

SHORESIDE LOANS, LLC VS JOHN VO

Case Summary

On 06/01/2016 SHORESIDE LOANS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOHN VO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0119

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORESIDE LOANS LLC

3807 Grand View Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90066

Defendant

VO JOHN

Orange, CA 92865

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/13/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/11/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/11/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/11/2016

8/11/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/11/2016

Minute Order - (Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims))

8/11/2016: Minute Order - (Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims))

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/1/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/1/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Minute Order (Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Updated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Result Date changed from 06/13/2016 to 08/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/11/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 08/11/2016; Result Type to Not Held - Taken off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to plaintiff request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: John Vo (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 96.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 08/11/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160606E5578 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160606E5578 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: John Vo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.