This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 09:44:55 (UTC).

SHORESIDE LOANS LLC VS JEFFREY SCOTT

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 SHORESIDE LOANS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JEFFREY SCOTT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1734

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORESIDE LOANS LLC

5757 W. Century Blvd #500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant

SCOTT JEFFREY

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/21/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

9/21/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/21/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 09/21/2016

9/21/2016: Minute Order of 09/21/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/21/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/12/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

11/3/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

11/3/2016: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

10/7/2016: RETURNED MAIL - (notice of entry of judgment)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

7/26/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

7/26/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/26/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/26/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2016
  • Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,610.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2016-0006043 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL (notice of entry of judgment); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Shoreside Loans LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/21/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Shoreside Loans LLC against Defendant JEFFREY SCOTT on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shoreside Loans LLC on 07/26/2016 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $110.00 for a total of $2,610.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shoreside Loans LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEFFREY SCOTT (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: No; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160728E8267 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160728E8267 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shoreside Loans LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JEFFREY SCOTT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.