This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2019 at 14:42:07 (UTC).

SHORESIDE LOANS, LLC VS BONIFACIO LORENZO

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 SHORESIDE LOANS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BONIFACIO LORENZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0222

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHORESIDE LOANS LLC

5757 Century Blvd., # 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant

LORENZO BONIFACIO

Long Beach, CA 90810

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

12/4/2017: Writ - Return

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Acceptance

Writ of Execution - (Santa Clara)

2/2/2017: Writ of Execution - (Santa Clara)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/8/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

8/3/2016: Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/3/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/20/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/3/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/6/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/03/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/3/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/03/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/3/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/09/2018 ; Status Date changed from 08/03/2016 to 01/09/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/09/2018 ; Status Date changed from 01/09/2018 to 01/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Bonifacio Lorenzo (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Partially Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 144.00; Interest Credits: 22.85; Principal Credits: 520.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Partially Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Santa Clara): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Santa Clara): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Address for Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Santa Clara); Issued by: Clerk; County: Santa Clara; Principal: 520.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: IW-2017-0009188 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Writ of Execution (Santa Clara); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Shoreside Loans, LLC against Defendant Bonifacio Lorenzo on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shoreside Loans, LLC on 06/06/2016 for the principal amount of $415.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $520.00.; Other: Default judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Bonifacio Lorenzo (Defendant); Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1160607E8592 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1160607E8592 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/03/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Acceptance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shoreside Loans, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Bonifacio Lorenzo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less