This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2019 at 00:33:26 (UTC).

SHOHREH RASHTIAN VS SMITH MEDICAL, ASD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 SHOHREH RASHTIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMITH MEDICAL, ASD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3885

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASHTIAN SHOHREH

Tarzana, CA 91356

Defendants

SMITH MEDICAL ASD

6000 Nathan Lane N

Minneapolis, MN 55442

SWAM SAMUEL

Rome, NY 13440

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Due Diligence

5/29/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Due Diligence

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

6/4/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

5/10/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/4/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2019

6/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2019

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/11/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/19/2019

2/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/19/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/25/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Shohreh Rashtian on 05/10/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Shohreh Rashtian as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/27/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/21/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/04/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/27/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff); As to: Smith Medical, ASD (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/15/2019; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence; Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/04/2019 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): Filed By: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/19/2019; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shohreh Rashtian (Plaintiff); As to: Smith Medical, ASD (Defendant); Samuel Swam (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Samuel Swam (Defendant), Smith Medical, ASD (Defendant) to Samuel Swam (Defendant), Smith Medical, ASD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/19/2019 08:30 AM at Department S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less