This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2020 at 04:11:17 (UTC).

SHIRLEY LINDSAY VS 1777 WESTWOOD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 SHIRLEY LINDSAY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against 1777 WESTWOOD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1891

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDSAY SHIRLEY

Defendants

HALAVY FARZIN

1777 WESTWOOD LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SOONTORNVIPAT SUTTHIWAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARSON CHRISTINA MICHELLE

BALLISTER RAYMOND GEORGE JR

Defendant Attorney

HALAVI VIDA

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/11/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Motion for Summary Adjudication - Motion for Summary Adjudication

11/25/2019: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Motion for Summary Adjudication

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication

1/30/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Vida Halavi in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion

1/30/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Vida Halavi in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Defendant's P&A and Exhibits in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication

1/30/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Defendant's P&A and Exhibits in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)]

2/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

2/13/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

2/18/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

2/18/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

3/17/2020: Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/17/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Answer - Answer

12/10/2018: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

10/23/2018: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - on Complaint

9/19/2018: Summons - on Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketAddress for Christina Michelle Carson (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Shirley Lindsay on 09/19/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Shirley Lindsay as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/04/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Shirley Lindsay (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sutthiwan Soontornvipat (Defendant); As to: Shirley Lindsay (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sutthiwan Soontornvipat (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shirley Lindsay (Plaintiff); As to: Sutthiwan Soontornvipat (Defendant); Service Date: 10/03/18; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shirley Lindsay (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shirley Lindsay (Plaintiff); As to: 1777 Westwood Limited Partnership, (Defendant); Farzin Halavy (Defendant); Sutthiwan Soontornvipat (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC11891    Hearing Date: February 13, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

(CCP § 437c)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay’s Motion for Summary Adjudication is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

OPPOSITION: Filed on January 30, 2020 [ ] Late 

REPLY: None filed as of February 8, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On September 19, 2018, Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for damages for violations of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendants 1777 Westwood Limited Partnership (“1777 Westwood”), Farzin Halavy (“Halavy”), and Sutthiwan Soontornvipat (“Soontornvipat”). Defendant Soontornvipat filed an Answer on October 23, 2018 and Defendants 1777 Westwood and Halavy filed their Answer on December 10, 2018.

On November 25, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Summary Adjudication (the “Motion”). On January 30, 2020, Defendants 1777 Westwood and Halavy filed an Opposition, noting that Plaintiff failed to serve Defendant Soontornvipat.

On February 5, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Withdrawal of the Motion for Summary Adjudication, acknowledging her failure to serve Defendant Soontornvipat and requesting that the Motion be taken off calendar. Accordingly, the Motion is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay’s Motion for Summary Adjudication is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.