This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2020 at 11:34:24 (UTC).

SHERWOOD MOBILE HOME PARK VS PEGGY GREEN

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 SHERWOOD MOBILE HOME PARK filed an Other lawsuit against PEGGY GREEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3540

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHERWOOD MOBILE HOME PARK

Respondent

GREEN PEGGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TREVILLYAN JONATHAN T

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/27/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition To Declare Mobile Home Abandoned

10/27/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition To Declare Mobile Home Abandoned

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

10/27/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition To Declare Mobile Home Abandoned scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Petition filed by Sherwood Mobile Home Park on 10/27/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Sherwood Mobile Home Park as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition To Declare Mobile Home Abandoned; Filed by: Sherwood Mobile Home Park (Petitioner); As to: Peggy Green (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherwood Mobile Home Park (Petitioner); As to: Peggy Green (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition To Declare Mobile Home Abandoned scheduled for 03/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERWOOD MOBILE HOME PARK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN T. TREVILLYAN