This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 13:53:39 (UTC).

SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC. VS EDUARDO RAMOS

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDUARDO RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6611

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT CO. INC. DBA DANIEL'S JEWELERS

Defendant

RAMOS EDUARDO

Assignee

KBR INC. DBA RASH CURTIS & ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

OLIVEIRA DUANE STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

5/27/2020: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/27/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

6/29/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/29/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/30/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/24/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/24/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/14/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/20/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

12/20/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/20/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,405.50; Interest: 61.75; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Duane Steven Oliveira (Attorney); As to: KBR, INC. (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: KBR, INC. (Assignee); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 61.75; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Assignment of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Sherwood Management Co. Inc. (Plaintiff) to Sherwood Management Co. Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: KBR, INC. (Assignee); Mailing Date: 05/22/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: KBR, INC. (Assignee); As to: Sherwood Management Co. Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sherwood Management Co. Inc. DBA Daniel's Jewelers against Defendant Eduardo Ramos on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sherwood Management Co. Inc. on 12/20/2019 for the principal amount of $2,240.50 and costs of $165.00 for a total of $2,405.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/24/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sherwood Management Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Ramos (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/07/2020; Service Cost: 115.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sherwood Management Co. Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Eduardo Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHERWOOD MANAGEMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oliveira, Duane S