This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 22:43:37 (UTC).

SHERRIE LYNN ROSSI VS SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL , INC. CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 SHERRIE LYNN ROSSI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL , INC CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1496

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSSI SHERRIE LYNN

Defendant

SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL INC. CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

11/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

11/23/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice (name extension) - Notice Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Required (NSF)

11/20/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Required (NSF)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/12/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

1/5/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

1/4/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

1/4/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/19/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/19/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/19/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sherrie Lynn Rossi on 11/12/2020 as follows: Defendant San Fernando Community Hospital , Inc. Corporation does not owe the plaintiff Sherrie Lynn Rossi any money on plaintiff's claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/19/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 02/19/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff); As to: San Fernando Community Hospital , Inc. Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/25/2021; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/19/2021 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Required (NSF); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Clerk's Notice of Filing Fees Required (NSF): As To Parties changed from Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff) to Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sherrie Lynn Rossi (Plaintiff); As to: San Fernando Community Hospital , Inc. Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less