This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2019 at 14:06:20 (UTC).

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC., INC. VS MOHAMMAD ALI FAKHARIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC , INC against MOHAMMAD ALI FAKHARIAN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2895

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC. INC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FAKHARIAN MOHAMMAD ALI

TAGHAVIGOLCHINI MARYAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JOSEPH C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MAJD FARBOOD

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/29/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/28/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To be Relieved as Counsel)

10/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To be Relieved as Counsel)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

10/22/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/22/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/24/2019: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application - Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/24/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/25/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Maryam Ta...)

9/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Maryam Ta...)

Reply (name extension) - Reply Support Motion to Compel

8/27/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply Support Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini

7/22/2019: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Notice E-Filing Rejection

6/27/2019: Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum Notice E-Filing Rejection

Answer - Answer

6/4/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/25/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • Hearing03/28/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Hearing09/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Hearing04/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Hearing11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND TO CONTINUE COURT-ORDERED DEPOSITION DATE scheduled for 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant); As to: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant); As to: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant); As to: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/24/2019; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammad Ali Fakharian (Defendant); Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammad Ali Fakharian (Defendant); Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammad Ali Fakharian (Defendant); Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sherman Way Townhomes Assoc., Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mohammad Ali Fakharian (Defendant); Maryam Taghavigolchini (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC02895    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC., INC., etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

MOHAMMAD ALI FAKHARIAN, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: 19STLC02895

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: January 31, 2020

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

CMC: February 20, 2020

Farbood Majd seeks to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini. Counsel’s motion is compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.

In connection with the motion to be relieved as counsel, Farbood Majd declares that: (1) the attorney-client relationship has completely broken down; (2) the breakdown in communication and trust has made it impossible to reasonably represent the client; (3) counsel has received critical information, which the client failed to disclose to counsel, which would result in violation of his ethical obligations to the court, the general public, and the opposing attorney; (4) he has been unable to obtain a voluntarily signed substitution of attorney; and (5) his continued representation of the client under these circumstances will only prejudice the client, as there will be an irremediable conflict of interest between attorney and client.

The Court has discretion on whether to allow an attorney to withdraw, and a motion to withdraw will not be granted where withdrawal would prejudice the client. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

In light of the facts above, the Court GRANTS Farbood Majd’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini.

Farbood Majd is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 31st day of January 2020

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: 19STLC02895    Hearing Date: December 26, 2019    Dept: 56

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SHERMAN WAY TOWNHOMES ASSOC., INC., etc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

MOHAMMAD ALI FAKHARIAN, etc., et al.,

Defendants.

CASE NO.: 19STLC02895

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Date: December 26, 2019

Time: 8:30 a.m.

Dept. 56

Farbood Majd seeks to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini. Counsel’s motion is compliant with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.1362.

In connection with the motion to be relieved as counsel, Farbood Majd declares that: (1) the attorney-client relationship has completely broken down; (2) the breakdown in communication and trust has made it impossible to reasonably represent the client; (3) counsel has received critical information, which the client failed to disclose to counsel, which would result in violation of his ethical obligations to the court, the general public, and the opposing attorney; (4) he has been unable to obtain a voluntarily signed substitution of attorney; and (5) his continued representation of the client under these circumstances will only prejudice the client, as there will be an irremediable conflict of interest between attorney and client.

The Court has discretion on whether to allow an attorney to withdraw, and a motion to withdraw will not be granted where withdrawal would prejudice the client. (Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

In light of the facts above, the Court GRANTS Farbood Majd’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Maryam Taghavigolchini.

Farbood Majd is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMC_DEPT56@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.

Dated this 26th day of December 2019

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Judge of the Superior Court