This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 11:01:05 (UTC).

SHEILA BYERS VS AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2020 SHEILA BYERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9629

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYERS SHEILA

Defendants

AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC.

CAPITAL AUTO SQUARE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMONS STEVEN AMES

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment Request for Judgement

11/24/2021: Judgment - Judgment Request for Judgement

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

7/29/2021: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

7/27/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/27/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order setting aside default

6/16/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order setting aside default

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

5/6/2021: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/16/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

4/16/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/16/2021: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Steven A. Simons RE Costs

4/16/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Steven A. Simons RE Costs

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/22/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Sheila Byers against Defendant Automax Motor Group Inc., a California Corporation on the Complaint filed by Sheila Byers on 11/17/2020 for damages of $10,500.00 and costs of $733.06 for a total of $11,233.06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketJudgment Request for Judgement; Signed and Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Request for Judgement: As To Parties changed from Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant) to Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sheila Byers on 11/17/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Sheila Byers as to Capital Auto Square LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketJudgment Request for Judgement - Rejected; Submitted by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketFinancial Statement; Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Capital Auto Square LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/27/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant); Capital Auto Square LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sheila Byers (Plaintiff); As to: Automax Motor Group Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMONS STEVEN AMES