This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 00:52:47 (UTC).

SHAWN HAWK VS JENNIFER MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 SHAWN HAWK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JENNIFER MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1161

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAWK SHAWN

Defendant

MARTINEZ JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN BARRY S.

 

Court Documents

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

10/5/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

10/5/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

10/5/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account - Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

11/5/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account - Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 10/05/2020

10/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 10/05/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

10/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Notice (name extension) - Notice Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

2/6/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/13/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SHAWN HAWK on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SHAWN HAWK and Austin Hawk as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAddress for Barry S. Bernstein (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Austin Hawk (Plaintiff); As to: JENNIFER MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by: Attorney; As to: Austin Hawk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Austin Hawk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Austin Hawk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise) of 10/05/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: SHAWN HAWK (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SHAWN HAWK (Plaintiff); As to: JENNIFER MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHAWN HAWK (Plaintiff); As to: JENNIFER MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHAWN HAWK (Plaintiff); As to: JENNIFER MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Status Date changed from 12/13/2019 to 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11161    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: 26

Hawk v. Martinez, et al

Petitioner Wynter Hawk’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Claim on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Austin Hawk is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 

Discussion

On December 5, 2019, Plaintiff Shawn Hawk (“Plaintiff Shawn Hawk”), individually and on behalf of minor Plaintiff Austin Hawk (“minor Claimant”), filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Jennifer Martinez (“Defendant”). On December 13, 2019, the Court granted Plaintiff Shawn Hawk’s Application to be Appointed Guardian Ad Litem for minor Claimant. On February 6, 2020, Petitioner Wynter Hawk (“Petitioner”) filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action (the “Petition”) on behalf of minor Claimant.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.) “‘[W]ithout trial court approval of the proposed compromise of the ward’s claim, the settlement cannot be valid.  [Citation.]  [¶] Nor is the settlement binding [on the minor] until it is endorsed by the trial court.’”  (Pearson v. Superior Court (2012) 202 Cal.App.4th 1333, 1338.)

“When a minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, or a person for whom a conservator has been appointed is a party, that person shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1) (emphasis added).) To obtain court approval of the settlement of a minor’s claims, the guardian ad litem must file a complete and “verified petition for approval of the settlement and must disclose ‘all information that has any bearing upon the reasonableness of the compromise.’  [Citations.]”  (Barnes v. Western Heritage Ins. Co. (2013) 217 Cal.App.4th 249, 256; CRC 7.950.)

The Petition is brought without a showing that Petitioner can represent minor Claimant under Code of Civil Procedure section 372, subdivision (a). Plaintiff Shawn Hawk was appointed minor Claimant’s guardian ad litem but inexplicably did not bring the Petition on his behalf. Instead, the Petition was brought by Wynter Hawk.

Additionally, the Court notes that Defendant has not yet been served with the Summons and Complaint in this action. The Court has no jurisdiction over Defendant at this time.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, Petitioner Wynter Hawk’s Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Claim on Behalf of Minor Plaintiff Austin Hawk is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNSTEIN BARRY S.