This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2016 at 23:12:59 (UTC).

SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC VS. ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2013 SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9580

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHATS INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

ROEKMAN ELIZABETH M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH TRENK - JOSEPH TRENK ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH TRENK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # SM015480016 . SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RECEIVED AS TO (SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 66.67 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. H. JAY FORD III PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING JOSEPH TRENK, ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/05/13 , FOR (SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC) , AGAINST (ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M.) , PAST DUE RENT $ 0.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 0.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ .00 , AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 6008 SIMPSON AVE NO. HOLLYWOOD, CA 91606 , AND THIS JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS OF THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CLERK'S JUDGMENT. ELIZABETH M. ROEKMAN FILED AN ANSWER ON 10-28-13. SUBMITTED ON 11/06/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (SHATS INVESTMENTS, LLC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL. NOT SIGNED. RESUBMIT SUBMITTED ON 11/01/13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketREQUEST RE: TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL RECEIVED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M.) . RECEIPT # F/W .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (ROEKMAN, ELIZABETH M.) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM405596014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/22/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . 102413

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less