Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 01:31:08 (UTC).

SHARON LYNETTE YOUNG VS GRACIELA LOPEZ GARCIA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by SHARON LYNETTE YOUNG against GRACIELA LOPEZ GARCIA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3777

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG SHARON LYNETTE

Defendant

LOPEZ GARCIA GRACIELA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

1/22/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

1/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

11/16/2018: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs - Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/16/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/25/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/10/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Sharon Lynette Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Graciela Lopez Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 11/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sharon Lynette Young against Defendant Graciela Lopez Garcia on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sharon Lynette Young on 09/10/2018 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $5,090.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $90.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Graciela Lopez Garcia. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/16/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 11/16/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sharon Lynette Young (Plaintiff); As to: Graciela Lopez Garcia (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sharon Lynette Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Sharon Lynette Young (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sharon Lynette Young (Plaintiff); As to: Graciela Lopez Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less