This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2017 at 08:45:42 (UTC).

SHARLETTE KANG VS AROMA SPA & SPORTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 SHARLETTE KANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AROMA SPA SPORTS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0452

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG SHARLETTE

Los Angeles, CA 90006

Defendant

AROMA SPA & SPORTS LLC

3680 Wilshire Blvd 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/8/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/13/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/30/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 12/08/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sharlette Kang against Defendant Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sharlette Kang on 10/30/2017 for the principal amount of $665.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $780.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sharlette Kang (Plaintiff); As to: Aroma Spa & Sports, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sharlette Kang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AROMA SPA AND SPORTS LLC is a litigant