This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2020 at 02:24:40 (UTC).

SHAQUITA WILLIAMS, ET AL. VS JOSE TORRES RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 SHAQUITA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSE TORRES RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0515

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WILLIAMS SHAQUITA

THOMAS SHAQUITA

WILLIAMS CORNELL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GUZMAN MAYA YESENIA

RODRIGUEZ JOSE TORRES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEUGELMANS JACQUES

Defendant Attorney

BURGOS RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/26/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/26/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

11/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/8/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

6/9/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

6/22/2020: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

3/8/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/15/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • Hearing06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); Cornell Williams (Plaintiff); Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant); As to: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant); As to: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 06/30/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 11/19/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 11/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant); As to: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); Cornell Williams (Plaintiff); Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/2019; Service Cost: 66.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); Cornell Williams (Plaintiff); Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff); Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); Cornell Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff); Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shaquita Williams (Plaintiff); Cornell Williams (Plaintiff); Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff); As to: Shaquita Thomas (Plaintiff); Jose Torres Rodriguez (Defendant); Maya Yesenia Guzman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00515    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC, rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING:

For the reasons stated below, the Motion to be Relieved as Counsel by Counsel for Plaintiffs Shaquita Wililams, Cornell Williams, Shaquita Thomas is GRANTED, upon the condition that Counsel lodge a proposed order (MC-053) to the court at or before the time of hearing.

I. Discussion & Order

On July 26, 2019, Counsel for Plaintiffs Shaquita Wililams, Cornell Williams, Shaquita Thomas (“Counsel”) filed a Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (the “Motion”).

The court may order that an attorney be changed or substituted at any time before or after judgment or final determination upon request by either client or attorney and after notice from one to the other. (CCP § 284(2).) “The determination whether to grant or deny a motion to withdraw as counsel lies within the sound discretion of the trial court.” (Manfredi & Levine v. Superior Court (1998) 66 Cal.App.4th 1128, 1133.) An application to be relieved as counsel must be made on Judicial Counsel Forms MC-051 (Notice of Motion and Motion), MC-052 (Declaration), and MC-053 (Proposed Order). (CRC 3.1362(a), (c), (e).) The requisite forms must be served “on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (Id. 3.1362(d).)

Counsel seeks to be relieved because there has been a complete breakdown in attorney-client communication between Counsel and Plaintiffs. Counsel has served the required papers on Plaintiffs at their current address after confirming the address by telephone and conversation. (MC-052, Item No. 3.) The Court is satisfied with Counsel’s reasoning for seeking to be relieved and finds that Counsel has satisfied the requirements of CRC 3.1362(a), (c)-(e). Trial is not scheduled until July 14, 2020, so Plaintiffs have sufficient time to find new counsel.

The unopposed Motion is, accordingly, GRANTED, upon the condition that Counsel lodge a proposed order (MC-053) to the court at or before the time of hearing. “After the order is signed, a copy of the signed order must be served on the client and on all parties that have appeared in the case.” (CRC 3.1362(e).) The Order on this Motion will not be effective “until proof of service of a copy of the signed order on [Plaintiffs] has been filed with the court.” (Id.)

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.