This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 00:38:01 (UTC).

SHANNON, EVELYN N. VS R22 INC.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2015 SHANNON, EVELYN N filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R22 INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8431

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANNON EVELYN N.

Defendants

STARFLINGER PETER

ORANGE HOLDING LLC

R22 INC DBA STAR MANAGEMENT LLC

PETER STARFLINGER

ORANGE HOLDING TWO LLC

R22 INC. DBA STAR MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate)

6/14/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Vacate)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2016

6/14/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/14/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/14/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Vacate scheduled for 06/14/2016 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketOrder for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to the oral request of Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHANNON, EVELYN N. on 11/24/2015 (from ING15S08431), judgment entered on 05/10/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHANNON, EVELYN N. on 11/24/2015 (from ING15S08431), judgment entered on 05/10/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHANNON, EVELYN N. on 11/24/2015 (from ING15S08431), judgment entered on 05/10/2016 as to EVELYN N. SHANNON is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by SHANNON, EVELYN N. on 11/24/2015 (from ING15S08431), judgment entered on 05/10/2016 as to EVELYN N. SHANNON is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (SHANNON, EVELYN N.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/14/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (R22 INC.)DBA(STAR MANAGEMENT) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/05/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (PETER STARFLINGER) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/05/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (STARFLINGER, PETER) . RECEIPT # ING498850008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/05/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (SHANNON, EVELYN N.) FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (R22 INC,) WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS (STAR MANAGEMENT LLC) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/05/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING502347007. HEARING SET FOR 02/05/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (SHANNON, EVELYN N.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (SHANNON, EVELYN N.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R22 INC. DBA STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE HOLDINGS LLC. is a litigant