Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 16:20:03 (UTC).

SHANE COHEN VS MARIA SWANN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 SHANE COHEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIA SWANN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2004

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN SHANE

Defendants

SWANN MARIA

COLDWELL BANKER REALTY - MALIBU COLONY

MERRICK BRIAN

COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/2/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/9/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

3/25/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

3/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/8/2021: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

1/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/1/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

2/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/11/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Attachment - Attachment

12/16/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/16/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

12/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Hearing05/28/2021 at 01:30 PM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Swann (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 04/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Swann (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Brian Merrick (Defendant), Maria Swann (Defendant), Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC (Defendant) to Brian Merrick (Defendant), Maria Swann (Defendant), Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Swann (Defendant); Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC (Defendant); Brian Merrick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAddress for Shane Cohen (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Request to Waive Court Fees]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shane Cohen (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Swann (Defendant); Coldwell Banker Realty - Malibu Colony (Defendant); Brian Merrick (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER REAL ESTATE LLC is a litigant