This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/01/2020 at 02:34:09 (UTC).

SHAKEEL AMEEN VS PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 SHAKEEL AMEEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0342

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMEEN SHAKEEL

Defendants

MALIK HASHMATH ALI

PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC

MALIK ARIFA H

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/21/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/4/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/5/2020: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

3/5/2020: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/9/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Attachment - Attachment

7/21/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2020

10/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Shakeel Ameen on 01/21/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to the Courts orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2020 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 10/30/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/30/2020 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 05/14/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shakeel Ameen (Plaintiff); As to: PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Shakeel Ameen (Plaintiff); As to: HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Shakeel Ameen (Plaintiff); As to: ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/24/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant), ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant), HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant) to ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant), PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant), HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant), PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant), ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant) to PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant), ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant), HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Shakeel Ameen (Plaintiff); As to: PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC (Defendant); ARIFA H MALIK (Defendant); HASHMATH ALI MALIK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME TIME TOURS AND TRAVEL INC. DBA is a litigant