This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 18:16:06 (UTC).

SHAHEEN TRANSPORT LLC VS OTX LOGISTICS INC

Case Summary

On 02/07/2017 SHAHEEN TRANSPORT LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OTX LOGISTICS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1806

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAHEEN TRANSPORT LLC

Defendant

OTX LOGISTICS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE KASSAKHIAN LAW FIRM PC

PC THE KASSAKHIAN LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/07/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 02/07/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER CONTRACTUAL DISPUTE Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shaheen Transport, LLC, a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where OTX LOGISTICS INC. is a litigant