This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2019 at 01:26:41 (UTC).

SHAFIEI, MINA VS THE MALIK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 SHAFIEI, MINA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE MALIK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART and CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9024

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAFIEI MINA

Defendants

THE MALIK CORPORATION

1110 GLENVILLE LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/18/16 . FOR (SHAFIEI, MINA) . AGAINST (THE MALIK CORPORATION) , (1110 GLENVILLE, LLC) . PRINCIPAL $ 110.00 . COSTS $ 155.00 . TOTAL $ 265.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. SEE NOTICE OF DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (THE MALIK CORPORATION) , (1110 GLENVILLE, LLC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:00P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. CAROL ROSE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/P0STPONEMENT OF (THE MALIK CORPORATION) , (1110 GLENVILLE, LLC) IS DENIED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON{S}: PARTY USING CHALLENGE COURT OFFICER OR TRIAL DATE? ORDER ATTACHED REQUESTING POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (THE MALIK CORPORATION) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. SW8 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # ING507980010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (THE MALIK CORPORATION) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/17/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 . DUE TO LATENESS OF HOUR, MATTER CONTINUED TO ABOVE DATE AND TIME FOR COURT TRIAL HEARING. ALL PARTIES HEREBY NOTIFIED TO APPEAR READY FOR TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (THE MALIK CORPORATION) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/26/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (1110 GLENVILLE, LLC) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/26/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING489149005. HEARING SET FOR 02/26/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less