This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2022 at 21:59:27 (UTC).

SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC VS JAMES G. HEBERT

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS NO 2 , LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES G HEBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2608

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2. LLC

Defendant

HEBERT JAMES G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal]

2/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal]

Application (name extension) - Application and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal

2/6/2020: Application (name extension) - Application and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

1/24/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/16/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/14/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES G. HEBERT )

12/13/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JAMES G. HEBERT )

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/13/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/12/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Application and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order to Vacate Entry of Judgment and for Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant); Type: No Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Complaint filed by SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC on 12/12/2019, judgment entered on 01/14/2020 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC on 12/12/2019, judgment entered on 01/14/2020 as to JAMES G. HEBERT is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC on 12/12/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to JAMES G. HEBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 58.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC against Defendant JAMES G. HEBERT on the Complaint filed by SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC on 12/12/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 20440 Anza Avenue, Apt. #331, Torrance, CA 90503 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to JAMES G. HEBERT; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC on 12/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant); Service Date: 12/26/2019; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SEVILLE TOWNHOUSE APTS. NO. 2., LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES G. HEBERT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY