This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2017 at 10:09:07 (UTC).

SEVADA HAROUNIAN VS FRED DAVID BERNHARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 SEVADA HAROUNIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRED DAVID BERNHARD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4205

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAROUNIAN SEVADA

Defendants

DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC.

BERNHARD FRED DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

6/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/1/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

6/1/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice of Postponement

7/13/2017: Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Unknown

8/9/2017: Unknown

Unknown

8/9/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

8/30/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

9/5/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

8/30/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

by Richard Hong

8/30/2017: by Richard Hong

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/13/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Unknown

9/19/2017: Unknown

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/20/2017 ; Status Date changed from 08/30/2017 to 09/20/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 09/20/2017 ; Status Date changed from 09/20/2017 to 09/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Sevada Harounian (Plaintiff); As to: Fred David Bernhard (Defendant); Descanso Gardens Guild, Inc. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/30/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/30/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 08/30/2017; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sevada Harounian against Defendant Descanso Gardens Guild, Inc. and Defendant Fred David Bernhard on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sevada Harounian on 06/01/2017 for the principal amount of $3,059.00 and costs of $185.00 for a total of $3,244.00, joint and several.; Other: damages sought excessive given totality of the evidence.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Richard Hong; Filed by: Descanso Gardens Guild, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sevada Harounian (Plaintiff); As to: Fred David Bernhard (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/02/17; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Sevada Harounian (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: 1170601E0739 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170601E0739 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sevada Harounian (Plaintiff); As to: Fred David Bernhard (Defendant); Descanso Gardens Guild, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESCANSO GARDENS GUILD INC is a litigant