This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2019 at 00:08:13 (UTC).

SETRAK AVEDESSIAN VS HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 SETRAK AVEDESSIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8478

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVEDESSIAN SETRAK

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HUNTINGTON HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMAN AFSHIN

11040 Santa Monica Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

GOLDSTEIN ROY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

8/5/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction - Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/9/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

11/6/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 11/06/2019

11/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 11/06/2019

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

7/31/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

7/31/2019: Summons - Summons on Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

7/31/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/31/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/31/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Continue Trial Date - Motion to Continue Trial Date

8/14/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date - Motion to Continue Trial Date

Summons - on Complaint

6/18/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/18/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/18/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/18/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Hearing05/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Continue Trial Date: Filed By: Huntington Hospital Medical Center (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of 11/06/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 11/06/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 11/06/2019; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/11/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 09/18/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/06/2019 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Huntington Hospital Medical Center (Defendant); As to: Roes 1-25 (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Setrak Avedessian (Plaintiff); As to: Huntington Hospital Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Setrak Avedessian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Setrak Avedessian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Setrak Avedessian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08478    Hearing Date: November 06, 2019    Dept: 94

Avedessian v. Huntington Hospital, et al.

MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

(CRC 3.1332)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant/Cross-Complainant Huntington Hospital Medical Center’s Motion to Continue Trial Date is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On June 18, 2018, Plaintiff Setrak Avedessian (“Avedessian”) filed a Complaint against Defendant Huntington Hospital Medical Center (“HHMC”) for negligence arising from a car accident. On August 14, 2019, HHMC filed the instant Motion to Continue Trial Date (the “Motion”).

II. Legal Standard

“To ensure the prompt disposition of civil cases, the dates assigned for a trial are firm.  All parties and their counsel must regard the date set for trial as certain.”  (California Rules of Court, section 3.1332(a).) “A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial, whether contested or uncontested or stipulated to by the parties, must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application under the rules in chapter 4 of this division, with supporting declarations.  The party must make the motion or application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered.”  (Id. 3.1332(b).)

“Although continuances of trials are disfavored, each request for a continuance must be considered on its own merits.  The court may grant a continuance only on an affirmative showing of good cause requiring the continuance.” (Id. 3.1332(c).)

“[T]he court must consider all the facts and circumstances that are relevant to the determination. These may include:

(1)The proximity of the trial date;

(2)Whether there was any previous continuance, extension of time, or delay of trial due to any party;

(3)The length of the continuance requested;

(4)The availability of alternative means to address the problem that gave rise to the motion or application for a continuance;

(5)The prejudice that parties or witnesses will suffer as a result of the continuance;

(6)If the case is entitled to a preferential trial setting, the reasons for that status and whether the need for a continuance outweighs the need to avoid delay;

(7)The court’s calendar and the impact of granting a continuance on other pending trials;

(8)Whether trial counsel is engaged in another trial;

(9)Whether all parties have stipulated to a continuance;

(10)Whether the interests of justice are best served by a continuance, by the trial of the matter, or by imposing conditions on the continuance; and

(11)Any other fact or circumstance relevant to the fair determination of the motion or application.”

(Id. 3.1332(d).)

III. Discussion

Trial is currently set for December 16, 2019. HHMC seeks to continue the trial date because Plaintiff did not serve HHMC with the Summons and Complaint until 13 months after this action was filed. (Notice of Motion p. 2.) As a result, HHMC has not been afforded sufficient time to prepare for trial and conduct discovery. (Id.) Plaintiff has not opposed the Motion. The trial date has not been continued before, and the Court discerns no prejudice to Plaintiff by continuing the trial date. “Although continuances of trials are disfavored,” the Court finds good cause to continue the trial date.

IV. Conclusion & Order

For good cause shown, the unopposed Motion is GRANTED.

The trial date of December 16, 2019 is ADVANCED to today’s date and CONTINUED to May 11, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 94. All discovery cutoff dates to follow the new trial date.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court’s website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.