This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2019 at 00:58:33 (UTC).

SERGIO ALCAZAR, ET AL. VS RONALD JUNG

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 SERGIO ALCAZAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RONALD JUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6000

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALCAZAR JEANINE

Norwalk, CA 90650

ALCAZAR SERGIO

Norwalk, CA 90650

Defendant

JUNG RONALD

Cerritos, CA 90703-3363

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/11/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/26/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

4/26/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 04/26/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 04/26/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

3/7/2019: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

3/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment]

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

3/7/2019: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/11/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/11/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff Sergio Alcazar and Plaintiff Jeanine Alcazar against Defendant Ronald Jung on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sergio Alcazar, et al. on 11/26/2018 for the principal amount of $1,700.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,790.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sergio Alcazar, et al. on 11/26/2018, judgment entered on 02/11/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sergio Alcazar, et al. on 11/26/2018, judgment entered on 02/11/2019 as to Ronald Jung is

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo) of 04/26/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 04/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 04/26/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Ronald Jung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 04/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Sergio Alcazar and Plaintiff Jeanine Alcazar against Defendant Ronald Jung on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sergio Alcazar, et al. on 11/26/2018 for the principal amount of $1,800.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,890.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sergio Alcazar (Plaintiff); Jeanine Alcazar (Plaintiff); Ronald Jung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sergio Alcazar (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald Jung (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 02/11/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sergio Alcazar (Plaintiff); Jeanine Alcazar (Plaintiff); As to: Ronald Jung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less