This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 05:00:08 (UTC).

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC VS MIRANDA, GUILLERMO J

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIRANDA, GUILLERMO J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0793

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

MIRANDA GUILLERMO J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED + APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED + WRIT ISSUED ON 04/12/16 RETURNED TO ATTORNEY IN ATTACHED ENVELOPE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP JUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 03/21/16 DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 03/21/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • DocketRETURNED CORRESPONDENCE + RETURNED CORRESPONDENCE + NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) TO: GUILLERMO J MIRANDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 08/22/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less