This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:56:05 (UTC).

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC VS DOMINGUEZ, JUAN

Case Summary

On 06/15/2016 SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ, JUAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2412

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

DOMINGUEZ JUAN

CRUZ MARIA RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPlaintiffs SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketCI31A-MINS CIVIL MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketIn Dept. NWH, Honorable MARILYN M. MORDETZKY,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPursuant to WRITTEN Stipulation, the parties applied to the court for

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketCOMMISSIONER, Presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Docketjudgment, which was so ordered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES CASE NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketTRACY KINCHELOE , clerk DOMINGUEZ, JUAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Docket- - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff(s) Defendant(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS TENTATIVELY GRANTED PURSUANT TO Judgment for all Unnamed Occupants tentatively granted pursuant to CCP 415.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 12/12/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less