This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:29:11 (UTC).

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC VS ARRIAGA, BRYAN STEVE

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARRIAGA, BRYAN STEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3801

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEPULVEDA PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

ARRIAGA BRYAN STEVE

COBLE SILVIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING ALLEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED + APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED + WRIT ISSUED ON: 11/9/2016 RETURNED VIA: SASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketNORTHWEST DISTRICT-VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketTRACY KINCHELOE , clerk ARRIAGA, BRYAN STEVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT FAILING CASE NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order Appointing Temporary Judge filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketWitness(es) sworn for the Plaintiff(s): LILIA GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketDEPT. NWH PAGE 001 OF 001 PAGES DATE OF PROCEEDINGS: 10/24/16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR UNNAMED OCCUPANTS GRANTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH CCP 415.4 Default for Unnamed Occupants granted in accordance with CCP 415.4

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 03/14/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less