This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 12:37:41 (UTC).

SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD VS SMITH GRAPHICS SERVICE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD filed an Other lawsuit against SMITH GRAPHICS SERVICE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1201

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY LTD

Defendants

SMITH GRAPHICS SERVICE COMPANY

SMITH TED A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISCHER-REYES JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/27/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/19/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/23/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/13/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/13/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/29/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/29/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/17/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2018: Proof of Personal Service

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Ted A. Smith (Defendant); Service Date: 03/06/2018; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Ted A. Smith (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Ted A. Smith; On the Complaint filed by Sentinel Insurance Company LTD on 01/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 10/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 07/17/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Ted A. Smith (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/07/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10, inclusive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Ted A. Smith (Defendant); Service Date: 03/06/18; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Smith Graphics Service Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sentinel Insurance Company LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER FILED

By: JENNA L. FISCHER-REYES, State Bar No.: 192387 Superior C o 1551 North Tustin Ave, Suite 830 Clonnie g:.",'tn(:ffiii'l:f":"'? Santa Ana, CA 92705 e (714) 571-0407 FAX: (877) 369-5799 APR 172018

2579 [fi)m@ Line: (71f’f) 371-2735 ‘ Sherri R, Garier, R ~ E-Mail: Jenna.Fischer-Reyes@thehartford.com ’fiuerk of Cour, Mailing Address: P.O. Box 2282, Brea, CA 92822-2.’289.y De

Judi Larg » Jeputy Attorneys for Plaintiff, Sentinel Insurance Company, LTD.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - STANLEY MOSK UNLIMITED

SENTINEL INSURANCE COMPANY, CASE NO. 18STLC01201 LiTEY HON. YOLANDA OROZCO Plaintiff, LIEFLY 7T VS. PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AND COMPLAINT ON TED A. SMITH GRAPHICS SERVICE COMPANY ., SMITH entity unknown; TED A. SMI'TH. an individual and owner of Smith Graphics Service Company; and DOES [-25, inclusive,

Date Action Filed: July 17,2018 Trial Date: None set

Defendants.

By Fax

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISCHER-REYES JENNIFER