This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:39:57 (UTC).

SENSE DESIGN VS BEN AFARI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SENSE DESIGN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEN AFARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3537

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENSE DESIGN

Defendants

AFARI VIDA

AFARI BEN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Sense Design (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sense Design on 12/06/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sense Design as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Sense Design (Plaintiff); As to: Ben Afari (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/24/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sense Design (Plaintiff); As to: Ben Afari (Defendant); Vida Afari (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less