This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 05:51:54 (UTC).

SENEL, BOB VS LIN, KEVIN

Case Summary

On 07/18/2012 SENEL, BOB filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIN, KEVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER A. HERNANDEZ and MICHAEL SMITH. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1343

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PETER A. HERNANDEZ

MICHAEL SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SENEL BOB

Defendants

LIN KEVIN

YANG JOHNSON

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT L

MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT12J01343 TO ALH12J01343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • MATTER TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 002 FOR TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. PETER A. HERNANDEZ PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING BY KEVIN LIN . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 11/29/12 . FOR (SENEL, BOB) . AGAINST (LIN, KEVIN) . PRINCIPAL $ 3000.00 , COSTS $ 90.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , AND SUPERIOR COURT COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 3090.00 . DEFENDANTS JOHNSON YANG AND MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC DO NOT OWE PLAINTIFF ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF`S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED BY (SENEL, BOB) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 11/29/12 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 . RECEIPT # CIT477243009 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE RE: HEARING FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • ORDER RE: REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT SIGNED BY MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL AND FILED. THE REQUEST IS DENIED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • CLERK`S NOTICE ORDER RE: REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. MICHAEL SMITH PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY KEILY SALGUERO,REP . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT (S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/29/12 . FOR (SENEL, BOB) . AGAINST (LIN, KEVIN) , (YANG, JOHNSON) , (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, L) . PRINCIPAL $ 3000.00 . COSTS $ 90.00 . TOTAL $ 3090.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. VENUE CHALLENGE DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (LIN, KEVIN) , (YANG, JOHNSON) , (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, L) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2012
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: VENUE RECEIVED FROM (LIN, KEVIN) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY ANN CHIY ON BEHALF OF KEVIN LIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY ANN CHIY ON BEHALF OF MEILOON INVESMENT & DEVELOPMENT, LLC. KEVIN LIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY ANN CHIY ON BEHALF OF JOHNSON YANG .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1120719E0156. HEARING SET FOR 08/29/12 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT, L) (YANG, JOHNSON) (LIN, KEVIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEILOON INVESTMENT & DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant