Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2020 at 03:57:22 (UTC).

SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC VS NITU CHANDRA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 SELMA VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NITU CHANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2488

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD LLC

Defendant

CHANDRA NITU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/23/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

12/23/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Nitu Chandra)

12/24/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Nitu Chandra)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/22/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/27/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/30/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

1/31/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 90.42

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC against Defendant Nitu Chandra on the Complaint filed by Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC on 12/23/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1540 N. Vine Street #743, Los Angeles, CA 90028 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant); Service Date: 01/06/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Nitu Chandra; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC on 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 01/06/2020; Service Cost: 60.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Selma & Vine Hollywood, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nitu Chandra (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS