Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2021 at 04:15:31 (UTC).

SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC VS GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 SELMA VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6188

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD LLC

Defendants

MACEDO MARCIO HENRIQUES

DEJESUS GLEISEJANE RABELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/27/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

1/4/2021: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/3/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

12/3/2020: Affidavit (name extension) - Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/6/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • Hearing11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE: As To Parties: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE: As To Parties: MARCIO HENRIQUES MACEDO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC on 11/06/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC as to MARCIO HENRIQUES MACEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS; On the Complaint filed by SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC on 11/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAffidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/29/2020; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketAffidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant); MARCIO HENRIQUES MACEDO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant); MARCIO HENRIQUES MACEDO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GLEISEJANE RABELO DEJESUS (Defendant); MARCIO HENRIQUES MACEDO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELMA & VINE HOLLYWOOD LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V