This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2018 at 10:36:00 (UTC).

SELF STORAGE MANAGEMENT COMPANY VS CARL MICHAEL CAMBRIDGE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 SELF STORAGE MANAGEMENT COMPANY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARL MICHAEL CAMBRIDGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2283

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELF STORAGE MANAGEMENT COMPANY

5221 W 102Nd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Defendant

CAMBRIDGE CARL MICHAEL AKA MICHAEL CAMBRIDGE AKA CARL M. CAMBRIDGE

Palm Desert, CA 92203

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/7/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

11/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/13/2017: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017

9/13/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/13/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/13/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Order on Request for Court Order

7/19/2017: Order on Request for Court Order

[Order on Request for Court Order]

7/25/2017: [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer

7/18/2017: Request for Court Order and Answer

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/14/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

7/14/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Self Storage Management Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carl Michael Cambridge (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 12/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 11/07/2017 to 12/28/2017 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 12/28/2017 ; Status Date changed from 12/28/2017 to 12/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/07/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 11/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Self Storage Management Company against Defendant Carl Michael Cambridge AKA Carl M. Cambridge, AKA Michael Cambridge on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Self Storage Management Company on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $1,015.00 and costs of $85.00 for a total of $1,100.00.; Other: Upon plaintiff's payment of the $1,100 total judgment on or before November 27, 2017, by cash or money order, Plaintiff shall allow Plaintiff access to his storage unit and to empty out its contents and remove everything in the locker. If the Defendant fails to pay the judgment in full and clear out the locker by November 27, Plaintiff may proceed with a lien sale of the contents of locker without any further notice to Mr. Cambridge and otherwise follow the lien sale proceedings as specified under the Code.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Self Storage Management Company (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170322E1112 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E1112 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Self Storage Management Company (Plaintiff); As to: Carl Michael Cambridge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less