This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 09:56:54 (UTC).

SELECTRONICS INC. VS KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2016 SELECTRONICS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. PORRAS and AMY YERKEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2223

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOSEPH R. PORRAS

Presiding Judge

AMY YERKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SELECTRONICS INC.

Defendant

KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - SEPEHR OMRANI

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

OMRANI SEPEHR

Defendant Attorney

KLASKIN HAROLD C

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

4/16/2018: Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 04/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (SELECTRONICS INC.) , RECEIPT NO. NOR498386020 . SASE. MG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/24/17 . FOR (SELECTRONICS INC.) . AGAINST (KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 16414.60 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 1250.00 . INTEREST $ 1942.77 . COSTS $ 420.00 . TOTAL $ 20,027.37 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SEB FOR CONSIDERATION .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • STIPULATION RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. RECEIPT # NOR244539006 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SELECTRONICS INC.) FOR REJECTION OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT; $20.00 STIP FEE IS REQUIRED. PLEASE RESUBMIT STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT WITH A CHECK FOR $20.00 SUBMITTED ON 04/07/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB , HON. AMY YERKEY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB . OSC RE: WHY SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A STIPULATED JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB , HON. AMY YERKEY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 06/01/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEB . OSC RE: WHY SANCTIONS/DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A STIPULATED JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS TO GIVE NOTICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 04/03/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEY .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • ANSWER FILED OF (KOBY INTERNATIONAL, INC.) . RECEIPT # NOR282406002 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 01/23/19 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY JOSEPH R. PORRAS, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965062. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOBY INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLASKIN HAROLD C.