This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 20:31:50 (UTC).

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE CO VS ABE`S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2014 SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE CO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABE S GARAGE DOORS GATES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BENNY C. OSORIO, DANIEL L. BRENNER, GRACIELA L. FREIXES, ROBERT J. SCHUIT and ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1816

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BENNY C. OSORIO

Presiding Judges

DANIEL L. BRENNER

GRACIELA L. FREIXES

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

TALIL OORI PRESIDENT

ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL ESQ

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/23/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/29/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Shasta)

4/30/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Shasta)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/16/2018 entered for Plaintiff (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) against Defendant Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc..

11/16/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/16/2018 entered for Plaintiff (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) against Defendant Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc..

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

11/16/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/16/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

11/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

7/31/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment...)

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment)

5/31/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default Judgment)

Order (name extension) - After Hearing (08/30/17) Imposing Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions, Evidence Sanctions, and Monetary Sanctions

3/22/2018: Order (name extension) - After Hearing (08/30/17) Imposing Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions, Evidence Sanctions, and Monetary Sanctions

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (COURT ORDER TO RESCHEDULE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PREVIOU...) of 03/26/2018

3/26/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (COURT ORDER TO RESCHEDULE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PREVIOU...) of 03/26/2018

Minute Order - (COURT ORDER TO RESCHEDULE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PREVIOU...)

3/26/2018: Minute Order - (COURT ORDER TO RESCHEDULE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING PREVIOU...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

9/19/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/19/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Shasta); Issued by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc. (Defendant); County: Shasta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc. (Defendant); Interest: 1309.82; Service Date: 04/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 09/29/2014, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) as to Oori Talil, President

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Oori Talil, President (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- 09/19/2017 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 77 to Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) against Defendant Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc. on the Complaint filed by SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 09/29/2014 for damages of $20,466.00, interest of $9,368.46, and costs of $445.00 for a total of $30,279.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY on 09/29/2014, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY), does 1-50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
125 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff); As to: Abe's Garage Doors & Gates Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/14; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ABE`S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY BENNY C. OSORIO, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY BENNY C. OSORIO, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 09/25/17 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • Docket***TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 77 ON 07/01/16*** STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA447586023. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

o LU OCML g

Timothy Carl Aires, Esq. (138169)

AIRES LAW FIRM

180 Newport Center Drive, Suite 260 Newport Beach, California 92660

(949) 718-2020 (949) 718-2021 FAX

‘ 1t of California Attorneys for Plaintiff, S“Sfififi{yocfiums Angeles

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SEP 29 20th

Sherri R. Carter, Executive Officer/Clerk

-, Deputy By

SUPERIOR COURT (LIMITED) OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY LOS ANGELES, CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE ) caseNo. 14 A21816 COMPANY, )

) COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF

Plaintiff, ) CONTRACT; BREACH OF CONTRACT ) v. )4 ($20,466.00 DEMANDED) % ) ABE’S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC.; ) [C.C.P. §425.10] - and DOES 1 through 50, inclusive, ) o

PRELIMINARY ALLEGATIONS

1. Plaintiff Security National Insurance Company is now, and at all times relevant hereto

was, a corporation duly organized and existing under the laws of the State of Texas. 2. Plaintiff is informed and believes and based thereon alleges that Defendant Abe’s

Garage Doors & Gates Inc. is now, and at all times relevant hereto was, a corporation organized

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE`S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRES TIMOTHY CARL