Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 03:28:48 (UTC).

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC VS EDWARD RICE

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDWARD RICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7708

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC

Defendant

RICE EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SU NANCY QI

 

Court Documents

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - waiver of attorney fees in support of entry of default judgment CC1717.5 and waiver of interest

4/9/2018: Declaration (name extension) - waiver of attorney fees in support of entry of default judgment CC1717.5 and waiver of interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED)

4/2/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED)

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/30/2018: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Judgment

5/30/2018: Judgment

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

4/9/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

4/9/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

4/9/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - plaintiffs summary of case in support of default judgment

4/9/2018: Declaration (name extension) - plaintiffs summary of case in support of default judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/9/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • Updated -- Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Writ - Return (UNSATISFIED) ( ); Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Writ of Execution (ALAMEDA); Issued by: Clerk; County: ALAMEDA; Principal: 10,272.72; Interest: 232.66; Costs: 10,530.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD RICE (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 232.66; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 08/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC against Defendant EDWARD RICE on the Complaint filed by SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC on 11/13/2017 for the principal amount of $9,990.72, attorney fees of $0.00, interest of $0.00, and costs of $282.00 for a total of $10,272.72.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Declaration waiver of attorney fees in support of entry of default judgment CC1717.5 and waiver of interest; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Declaration plaintiffs summary of case in support of default judgment; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC on 11/13/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 through 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD RICE (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/17; Service Cost: 57.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff); As to: EDWARD RICE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less