Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 15:22:12 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC VS KRISNA PEREZ

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KRISNA PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2669

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

PEREZ KRISNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARZIN ALI

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/13/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

4/29/2020: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Second Round Sub, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Krisna Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Second Round Sub, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Krisna Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Second Round Sub, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Krisna Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Second Round Sub, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Krisna Perez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less