This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 05:54:26 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND LP VS HILTERMAN, DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2017 SECOND ROUND LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HILTERMAN, DANIELLE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4062

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND LP

Defendant

HILTERMAN DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK - ALI FARZIN ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK

FARZIN ALI ESQ

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff (SECOND ROUND LP) against Defendant (HILTERMAN, DANIELLE).

12/3/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff (SECOND ROUND LP) against Defendant (HILTERMAN, DANIELLE).

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/19/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT ON ACCOUNT STATED

10/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT ON ACCOUNT STATED

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: CCP 1033

10/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: CCP 1033

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: ASSIGNMENT

10/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: ASSIGNMENT

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION OF DEBT BUYER CIVIL CODE 1788.60

10/19/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION OF DEBT BUYER CIVIL CODE 1788.60

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/25/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Proof of Personal Service

9/27/2017: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 07/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/03/2018 entered for Plaintiff (SECOND ROUND LP) against Defendant (HILTERMAN, DANIELLE). Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff (SECOND ROUND LP) against Defendant (HILTERMAN, DANIELLE) on the Complaint filed by SECOND ROUND LP on 07/26/2017 for the principal amount of $1,641.00 and costs of $315.00 for a total of $1,956.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: ASSIGNMENT; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT ON ACCOUNT STATED; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration RE: CCP 1033; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SECOND ROUND LP on 07/26/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by (SECOND ROUND LP), does 1-X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff); As to: DANIELLE HILTERMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to DANIELLE HILTERMAN; On the Complaint filed by SECOND ROUND LP on 07/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DEBT BUYER CIVIL CODE 1788.60; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- ALI FARZIN, ESQ (Attorney): Organization Name changed from LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK to FarMar Law Group, PC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: ALI FARZIN, ESQ (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (SECOND ROUND LP) (Plaintiff); As to: DANIELLE HILTERMAN (Defendant); Service Date: 08/27/2017; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 07/10/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA638681058. Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Second Round, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZIN, ALI