This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2021 at 00:05:36 (UTC).

SCHULLER & SCHULLER VS GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 SCHULLER SCHULLER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4114

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHULLER & SCHULLER

Defendants

GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING INC.

EASHAK GEDALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHULLER JEFFREY SIMON

Defendant Attorney

SUTTON RAYMOND M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/25/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer - Answer

6/5/2019: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

5/31/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

5/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/26/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/26/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/26/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Schuller & Schuller on 04/26/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Schuller & Schuller as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketAddress for Jeffrey Simon Schuller (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/26/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Gedalia Eashak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff); As to: Gedalia Eashak (Defendant); Service Date: 05/14/2019; Service Cost: 41.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff); As to: Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/14/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff); As to: Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc. (Defendant); Gedalia Eashak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff); As to: Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc. (Defendant); Gedalia Eashak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Schuller & Schuller (Plaintiff); As to: Green Sky Home Remodeling, Inc. (Defendant); Gedalia Eashak (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREEN SKY HOME REMODELING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHULLER JEFFREY SIMON