This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2016 at 15:07:33 (UTC).

SAUGUS COLONY LTD. VS. HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2014 SAUGUS COLONY LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL BUCKLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6441

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL BUCKLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAUGUS COLONY LTD. A CALIFORNIA LTD. PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

HARDIE-BROWN TIA SHANICE

BROWN BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON - SHERYL MANDELBAUM

Attorney at MANDELBAUM & ROBISON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/16/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. A/S . RECEIPT # 449566008 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 62.83 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 62.83 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE) , (BROWN, BRIAN) & ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BROWN, BRIAN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE) , (BROWN, BRIAN) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/24/14 , FOR (SAUGUS COLONY LTD.) A CALIFORNIA LTD. PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (HARDIE-BROWN, TIA SHANICE) , (BROWN, BRIAN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 27508 N. SPENCER COURT #101 SANTA CLARITA, CA 91387 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS463601008.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE THOSE DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THIS CASE TO A FINAL DISPOSITION . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY JUDGE DANIEL BUCKLEY . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/26/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. A02 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less