This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 13:18:06 (UTC).

SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN VS ELEN ARSHAKYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELEN ARSHAKYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4603

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYRAPETYAN SATENIK

Defendants

ISHKHANYAN KRISTINA

ARSHAKYAN ELEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERNSTEIN BARRY S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/18/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketAddress for Barry S. Bernstein (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN on 06/01/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ELEN ARSHAKYAN (Defendant); KRISTINA ISHKHANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ELEN ARSHAKYAN (Defendant); KRISTINA ISHKHANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SATENIK HAYRAPETYAN (Plaintiff); As to: ELEN ARSHAKYAN (Defendant); KRISTINA ISHKHANYAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNSTEIN BARRY S.