This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 03:55:26 (UTC).

SASHA CLAUDIA BOUIE, ET AL. VS MORGAN RHODES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 SASHA CLAUDIA BOUIE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORGAN RHODES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3534

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAKER MACKENZIE

BOUIE SASHA CLAUDIA

NORMAN SARAH KATHERINE

Defendants

WONDERLICH ANNMARIE T AKA ANNIE WONDERLICH

RHODES MORGAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

1/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/6/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Sasha Claudia Bouie, et al. on 12/06/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/30/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 01/30/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sasha Claudia Bouie (Plaintiff); Mackenzie Baker (Plaintiff); Sarah Katherine Norman (Plaintiff); As to: Morgan Rhodes (Defendant); Annmarie T Wonderlich (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less