This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2020 at 05:14:58 (UTC).

SARAH MCDERMOTT VS JAE HYUNG KIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 SARAH MCDERMOTT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAE HYUNG KIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5372

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDERMOTT SARAH

Defendants

KIM JAE HYUNG

MEISELMAN PATTI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KHODOROVSKY ASLAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/25/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/25/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/25/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sarah McDermott on 06/25/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sarah McDermott as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketAddress for Aslan Khodorovsky (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Aslan Khodorovsky (Attorney): Organization Name: Law Offices of Khodorovsky & Associates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sarah McDermott (Plaintiff); As to: Patti Meiselman (Defendant); Service Date: 08/07/2020; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sarah McDermott (Plaintiff); As to: Jae Hyung Kim (Defendant); Service Date: 08/07/2020; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sarah McDermott (Plaintiff); As to: Jae Hyung Kim (Defendant); Patti Meiselman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sarah McDermott (Plaintiff); As to: Jae Hyung Kim (Defendant); Patti Meiselman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sarah McDermott (Plaintiff); As to: Jae Hyung Kim (Defendant); Patti Meiselman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHODOROVSKY ASLAN