This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 05:23:36 (UTC).

SARA ORTEGA VS ABM PARKING SERVICES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 SARA ORTEGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ABM PARKING SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6691

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTEGA SARA

Defendant

ABM PARKING SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUTSOUKOS JOHN

Defendant Attorneys

WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY

BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/14/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/26/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

5/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Motions

3/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration in Support of Motions

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

3/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

3/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/24/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Notice of Lodgment in Support of Motions

3/24/2021: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Notice of Lodgment in Support of Motions

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

3/24/2021: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

12/28/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

10/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/10/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

8/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 07/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Sara Ortega (Plaintiff); As to: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Sara Ortega on 08/10/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sara Ortega as to ABM Parking Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAddress for John Koutsoukos (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sara Ortega (Plaintiff); As to: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ABM AVIATION, INC. Erroneously Sued As ABM Parking Services (Defendant); As to: Sara Ortega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sara Ortega (Plaintiff); As to: ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sara Ortega (Plaintiff); As to: ABM Parking Services (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC06691    Hearing Date: May 24, 2021    Dept: 26

Ortega v. ABM Parking Services, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant ABM Aviation, Inc.’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions; and (3) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, Set One and for Monetary Sanctions are CONTINUED TO JUNE 28, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

Defendant ABM Aviation, Inc. (“Defendant”) filed the instant (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One and Request for Sanctions (“the Motions”) on March 24, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Defendant filed a Notice of Lodging of Exhibits concurrently with the Motions with supporting exhibits, including the discovery served on Plaintiff Sara Ortega (“Plaintiff”). However, the Court never received any lodged exhibits in this case. Without the lodged exhibits, the Court cannot evaluate the merits of the discovery Motions.

Accordingly, Defendant ABM Aviation, Inc.’s (1) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Form Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions; and (2) Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Special Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions are CONTINUED TO JUNE 28, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

The Court also advances the hearing on Defendant ABM Aviation, Inc.’s Motion Compelling Plaintiff Sara Ortega to Respond to Request for Production of Documents, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions, which is set for hearing on May 25, 2021, to this date. THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT ABM AVIATION, INC.’S MOTION COMPELLING PLAINTIFF SARA ORTEGA TO RESPOND TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IS CONTINUED TO JUNE 28, 2021 AT ____ AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

AT LEAST 16 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEW HEARING DATE, DEFENDANT IS TO LODGE THE DOCUMENTS LISTED IN THE NOTICE OF LODGING. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN THE MOTIONS BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR DENIED.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM PARKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHHOLZ SCOTT D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAYNE ERIC JEFFREY