Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 07:00:22 (UTC).

SARA GONZALEZ VS MARIA LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 SARA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0174

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ SARA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

ALCALALOPEZ CELIA

LOPEZ MARIA

MISTER CAR WASH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

MISTER CAR WASH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHALHOUB GEORGE J.

Defendant Attorney

SPRIGGS SCOTT B.

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

3/9/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

3/9/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/9/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/7/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

1/7/2020: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • Hearing01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Hearing07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- CWP California Corp dba Mister Car Wash Erroneously Sued As Mister Car Wash (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Mister Car Wash to Mister Car Wash

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mister Car Wash (Defendant); As to: Sara Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mister Car Wash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: CWP California Corp dba Mister Car Wash Erroneously Sued As Mister Car Wash (Defendant); As to: Maria Lopez (Defendant); Celia Alcalalopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sara Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Mister Car Wash (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/2020; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sara Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Lopez (Defendant); Celia Alcalalopez (Defendant); Mister Car Wash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sara Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Lopez (Defendant); Celia Alcalalopez (Defendant); Mister Car Wash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sara Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Lopez (Defendant); Celia Alcalalopez (Defendant); Mister Car Wash (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less