This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2019 at 00:23:48 (UTC).

SAPAN PARMAR VS N/A N/A

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 a Other case was filed by SAPAN PARMAR against N/A N/A in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0826

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARMAR SAPAN

Respondent

N/A N/A

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/19/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice Proposed Order

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Proposed Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • Hearing on Petition To Approve (Minors) Compromise of Disputed Claim scheduled for 07/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice Proposed Order; Filed by: Sapan Parmar (Petitioner); As to: n/a n/a (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP00826    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 94

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Jyoti Parmar to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim on behalf of minor Claimant Sapan Parmar is GRANTED.

COMPLAINT: Petition to approve compromise of pending claim on behalf of minor for injuries sustained as a result of a motor vehicle accident.

REQUEST FOR RELIEF: Approve settlement reached on behalf of minor Sapan Parmar.

ANALYSIS:

On March 19, 2019, Petitioner Jyoti Parmar (“Petitioner”) filed a Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (the “Petition”) on behalf of minor Claimant Sapan Parmar (“Claimant”). Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.)

The Court notes that no Complaint has been filed in this action. Per CRC 7.950, the Court construes the instant Petition as “[a] petition for court approval of a compromise of or a covenant not to sue or enforce judgment.” “[A] minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, . . . shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (CCP § 372, emphasis added.) The Petition initially came for hearing on July 23, 2019, at which time the Court held that Petitioner had no standing to bring the Petition because she has not been appointed as Claimant’s guardian ad litem as required CCP § 372.

Petitioner filed an application to be appointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem on August 20, 2019. The application was rejected on September 16, 2019. Petitioner’s second application to be appointed Claimant’s guardian ad litem filed on November 6, 2019 has been granted. Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it to be complete, provides for a significant settlement to minor Plaintiff based on his injuries, and that proposed orders have been filed concurrently.

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Disputed Claim is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.